CA SB824 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 389, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 389, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2553.1 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to opticians.
Title
Opticians: regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB824 Negrete McLeod Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Assembly - SB 824 Negrete McLeod Senate Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB824 Negrete McLeod (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Assembly - SB 824 Negrete McLeod Senate Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB824 Negrete McLeod (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 389, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m. | |
2011-09-01 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2244.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-31 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2732.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-29 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2631.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-11 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-07 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-14 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-05-09 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-09 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 907.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-04 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-04-13 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-05 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 541.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-25 | Set for hearing April 4. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2553.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |