CA SB798 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 683, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 683, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 338 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 205.1, 714, 1050.8, 1053.5, 1055.1, 1056, 1059, 1764, 3050, 7149.2, 7149.3, 7150, 7860, 12002.2.1, 12153, and 13005 of, and to repeal Sections 1053, 1055, 1055.4, 1055.5, 1060, 1070, 3682, 3700, 6596, 7149, 7149.4, 7180, 7181, 7182, 7183, 7184, and 7186 of, the Fish and Game Code, to amend Section 113 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 741, 8301, 30301.2, 30304, and 30315 of, and to repeal Section 30310.5 of, the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 1026, 1055, 1228.1, 1228.2, 1228.3, 1228.6, 1229, 1229.1, 1243, 1260, 1427, 1430, 1437, 1440, 1701.2, 1703, 1726, 1727, and 1736 of, and to repeal Sections 1126.2, 2862, 2863, and 2866 of, the Water Code, relating to natural resources.
Title
Natural resources.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] |
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] | Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-01 - Senate - Special Consent #9 SB798 Committee On N.R. & W. (Pavley) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - SB 798 N.R.& W. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB798 Committee On N.R. & W. (Pavley) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - SB 798 N.R.& W. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB798 Committee On N.R. & W. (Pavley) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 683, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2380.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2639.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1073.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 821.) (April 28). |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 18. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |