CA SB784 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-10 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Glazer.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-10 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Glazer.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8596.1 to the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
State government: emergency services: nonprofit service providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-07 - Assembly - SB 784 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Luz Rivas (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB784 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB784 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Glazer. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2812.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Luz Rivas. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2021-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.M. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.M. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 887.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | April 5 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 588.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8596.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |