CA SB778 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 9880 and 9886.3 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 9880.1 of, to add Sections 9880.2 and 9880.4 to, and to add Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 9884.23) and Article 12 (commencing with Section 9890) to Chapter 20.3 of Division 3 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Automotive repair: oil changes: notification to customers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB778 Allen Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 778 Allen Senate Third Reading By SALAS (Y: 66 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB778 Allen (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 778 Allen Senate Third Reading By SALAS (Y: 66 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB778 Allen (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 5471.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 5436.) |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Set for hearing August 25. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5268.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 10. Page 6057.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 3.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and B. & P. |
2016-01-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 2944.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Set for hearing January 19. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2879.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Set for hearing January 11. |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-01-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-01-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 859.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 9880 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9880.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9884.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9886.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9890 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 48610.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 5096.520 | Amended Code | Citation Text |