CA SB758 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 682, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 682, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 8 (commencing with Section 347) to Chapter 2.5 of Division 1 of the Water Code, relating to climate change.
Title
Atmospheric Rivers: Research, Mitigation, and Climate
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB758 Block Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-04 - Assembly - SB 758 Block Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB758 Block (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-04 - Assembly - SB 758 Block Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB758 Block (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 682, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 5. Page 2565.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2926.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1288.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1159.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 821.) (April 28). |
2015-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12805.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25621 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 347 | New Code | See Bill Text |