CA SB748 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 626, 626.2, 626.4, and 626.6 of the Penal Code, relating to trespass, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Trespass: private universities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Assembly - SB 748 Portantino Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB748 Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB748 Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-07-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-07-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2022-06-30 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5640.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-01-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2776.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Portantino. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Portantino. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1203.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 690.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 626 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 626.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 626.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 626.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |