CA SB741 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 659, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 11 (commencing with Section 53166) to Chapter 1 of Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 5 of the Government Code, relating to communications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobile communications: privacy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB741 Hill Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Assembly - SB 741 Hill Senate Third Reading By GATTO (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB741 Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 659, Statutes of 2015.
2015-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-09SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2015-09-03SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2446.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2015-09-02SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2015-09-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2780.) Ordered to the Senate.
2015-08-31AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-17AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-07-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 15).
2015-06-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2015-06-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23).
2015-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and L. GOV.
2015-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1063.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-05-19SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 984.) (May 12).
2015-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 12.
2015-04-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2015-03-27SenateSet for hearing April 15.
2015-03-19SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD.
2015-03-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
2015-02-27SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code53166New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_741&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_741_bill_20150227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_741_bill_20150519_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_741_bill_20150624_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_741_bill_20150817_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_741_bill_20150831_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_741_bill_20150904_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_741_bill_20151008_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_741_vote_20150415_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_741_vote_20150512_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_741_vote_20150522_0952AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_741_vote_20150623_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_741_vote_20150715_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_741_vote_20150902_1052AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0701-0750/sb_741_vote_20150903_1055AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback