CA SB726 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44272 and 44272.4 of, and to add Sections 43018.4 and 44272.1 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
Alternative fuel and vehicle technologies: sustainable transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] | Sen. Dave Min [D] |
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB726 Gonzalez et al (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB726 Gonzalez et al (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Reyes. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 1380.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1202.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1. Page 943.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 757.) (April 12). |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referral to Com. on E., U. & C. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q., TRANS., and E., U. & C. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 43018.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44272 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44272.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44272.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |