CA SB722 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 679, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 679, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 35179.6 of the Education Code, relating to pupil safety.
Title
Pupil safety: swimming pools: adult presence: cardiopulmonary resuscitation training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB722 Melendez Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB722 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB722 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 679, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2357.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2664.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 2399.) |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rules suspended. |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-07-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1347.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1202.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 604.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | March 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 35179.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |