CA SB718 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 373, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 373, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 15630, 15630.1, and 15658 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Elder and dependent adult abuse: mandated reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB718 Vargas Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - SB 718 Vargas Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB718 Vargas (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - SB 718 Vargas Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB718 Vargas (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 373, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-30 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2156.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-25 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-08-25 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2596.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-08-18 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17). | |
2011-08-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-27 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-23 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21). | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. | |
2011-06-01 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1188.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-24 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-23 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. | |
2011-05-13 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-05 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-05-03 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2011-05-02 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 764.) (April 26). | |
2011-04-12 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2011-03-29 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. (Corrected April 8.) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15630 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15630.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15658 | Amended Code | Citation Text |