CA SB689 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 30610.91 to the Public Resources Code, relating to coastal resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local coastal program: bicycle lane: amendment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB689 Blakespear (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-06-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2024-06-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2024-05-13AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS.
2024-01-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2024-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 3048.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2024-01-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-01-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2024-01-12SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2024-01-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2024-01-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-01-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3. Page 2971.) (January 9).
2024-01-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 2958.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2024-01-05SenateSet for hearing January 9 in TRANS. pending receipt.
2024-01-04SenateSet for hearing January 9.
2024-01-03SenateRe-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and TRANS.
2024-01-03SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2024-01-03SenateJanuary 9 hearing postponed by committee.
2024-01-03SenateSet for hearing January 9.
2024-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2023-04-11SenateApril 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-03-30SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2023-03-29SenateRe-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and N.R. & W.
2023-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2023-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2023-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code30610.91New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback