CA SB681 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 499, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 499, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 81012 of, and to add Section 81012.5 to, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB681 Allen et al. Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 681 Allen Senate Third Reading By Friedman (Y: 61 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB681 Allen (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 681 Allen Senate Third Reading By Friedman (Y: 61 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB681 Allen (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 499, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 2794.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 18. Page 3351.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-08-28 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 16). |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 1341.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 424.) (March 21). |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 81012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 81012.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |