CA SB671 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 253, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 253, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 203, 203.1, and 220 of, and to add Section 201.6 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Employment: payment of wages: print shoot employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent SB671 Hertzberg Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Assembly - SB 671 Hertzberg Third Reading Urgency By Calderon (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB671 Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Assembly - SB 671 Hertzberg Third Reading Urgency By Calderon (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB671 Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 253, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2242.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2670.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 958.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From consent calendar on motion of Senator Hertzberg. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 654.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 201.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 203.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |