CA SB664 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 681, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 681, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10632.5 to the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water: urban water management planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB664 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Assembly - SB 664 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By LEVINE (Y: 71 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB664 Hertzberg (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Assembly - SB 664 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By LEVINE (Y: 71 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB664 Hertzberg (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 681, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2424.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 9. Page 2725.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 27). |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1305.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1158.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 821.) (April 28). |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 10540 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10632.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |