CA SB629 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 16 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 16 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23320 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: fees: adjustment: posting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 629 McGuire Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB629 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB629 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6309.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | (Received June 29 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(13)). |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1073.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 827.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |