CA SB622 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 3 (commencing with Section 87) to Division 1 of the Civil Code, relating to civil detention facilities.
Title
Civil detention facilities: state investigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB622 Durazo et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 622 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Bonta (Y: 64 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB622 Durazo (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 622 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Bonta (Y: 64 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB622 Durazo (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Veto sustained. | |
2020-01-13 | Stricken from file. | |
2019-10-13 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-10-13 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2883.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 11. Page 3328.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 30). |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | July 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 18). |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 1256.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1105.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 800.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 87 | New Code | See Bill Text |