CA SB622 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3041 and 3110 of, to add Sections 3041.4, 3041.5, 3041.6, 3041.7, and 3041.8 to, and to repeal and add Sections 3041.1, 3041.2, and 3041.3 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to optometry, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Optometry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB622 Hernandez (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | June 28 set for final hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | June 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | July 14 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | July 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 1070.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1034.) (May 18). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 794.) (April 27). |
2015-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | April 13 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and APPR. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2842 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3041.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3041.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3041.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3041.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3041.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |