CA SB622 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Part 14.5 (commencing with Section 32600) of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Taxation: sweetened beverage tax: Children's Health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 23. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 791.) (May 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 660.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 32600 | New Code | See Bill Text |