CA SB620 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-29 - June 29 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-29 - June 29 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23504 of, and to add Section 23661.4 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Craft distillers: delivery: direct shipper permits.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] |
Sen. Monique Limon [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB620 Allen et al (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Assembly | June 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 2. Page 2843.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2795.) (January 20). |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Set for hearing January 20. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | January 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 2746.) (January 11). |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Set for hearing January 11. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23504 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23661.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |