CA SB603 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-13 - June 13 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-13 - June 13 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 26249 of the Business and Professions Code, and to add Sections 17053.71 and 23687.5 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis license deferral and waiver fee program: tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB603 Bradford (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-13 | Assembly | June 13 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-06 | Assembly | June 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and B. & P. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 1324.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1198.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 814.) (April 15). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 670.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and GOV. & F. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26249 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.71 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23687.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |