CA SB601 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 403, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 403, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7159.5 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 802 of the Penal Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Professions and vocations: contractors: home improvement contracts: prohibited business practices: limitation of actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB601 McGuire Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Assembly - SB 601 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Berman (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB601 McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Assembly - SB 601 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Berman (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB601 McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 403, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2818.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3264.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-07-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2023-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and PUB. S. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1279.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1176.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 901.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 747.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25 in PUB S. pending receipt. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and PUB S. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7159.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |