CA SB588 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 803, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 803, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 10 (commencing with Section 690.020) to Division 1 of Title 9 of Part 2 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Section 98 of, and to add Sections 96.8, 238, 238.1, 238.2, 238.3, 238.4, 238.5, and 558.1 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: nonpayment of wages: Labor Commissioner: judgment enforcement.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] | Asm. Roger Hernandez [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Asm. Adam Gray [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB588 De Le (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 588 De Leon Senate Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB588 De Le (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 588 De Leon Senate Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB588 De Le (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 803, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2709.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 2964.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. (Corrected September 2). |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27). |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1206.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1157.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 820.) (April 29). |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 819.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29 in L. & I.R. pending receipt. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & I.R. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 690.020 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 238 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 238.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 238.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 238.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 238.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 238.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 2810 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 558.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 96.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |