CA SB587 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51 and 5813 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property taxation: inflation factor: senior citizens.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB587 Stone (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB587 Stone (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2016-08-10 | Assembly | August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 1). |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2016-01-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2945.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Set for hearing January 19. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2879.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Set for hearing January 11. |
2016-01-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | May 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and APPR. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 18645.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4052.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4127.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 5813 | Amended Code | Citation Text |