CA SB575 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 626, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 626, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 123110 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Patient access to health records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB575 Leyva Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 575 Leyva Senate Third Reading By QUIRK-SILVA (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB575 Leyva (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 575 Leyva Senate Third Reading By QUIRK-SILVA (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB575 Leyva (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 626, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 2996.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3397.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 1068.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 853.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 559.) (March 29). |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 123110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |