CA SB573 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2416 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: emergency vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB573 Lieu (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB573 Lieu (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2636.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 2591.) (January 14). |
2014-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Set for hearing January 14. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 2416 | Amended Code | Citation Text |