CA SB548 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 220, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 220, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 132652 and 132661 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Tri-Valley-San Joaquin Valley Regional Rail Authority: transit connectivity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-16 - Assembly - SB 548 Eggman Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB548 Eggman et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB548 Eggman et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 220, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2406.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1005.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 780.) (April 13). |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 132652 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 132661 | Amended Code | Citation Text |