CA SB54 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 308 of the Family Code, relating to family law.
Title
Family law: out-of-state same-sex marriages.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] | Asm. Julia Brownley [D] | Asm. Wesley Chesbro [D] | Asm. Mike Feuer [D] |
Sen. Christine Kehoe [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Asm. John Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB54 Leno (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-08 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Assembly - SB 54 Leno Senate Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 47 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB54 Leno (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-08 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Assembly - SB 54 Leno Senate Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 47 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB54 Leno (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-25 | Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-09 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2337.) To enrollment. | |
2009-09-08 | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 2353.) | |
2009-09-05 | Set for hearing September 8. | |
2009-09-04 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2227.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-09-03 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-09-03 | Read third time. Passed. To Senate. | |
2009-07-16 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-15 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2009-07-14 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on July 9.) | |
2009-07-06 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-06-30 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-06-26 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-24 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 23.) | |
2009-06-08 | To Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. | |
2009-05-14 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 885.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-28 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-27 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-04-17 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 497.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-03 | Set for hearing April 14. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 420.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-03-12 | Set for hearing April 1. | |
2009-01-29 | To Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. | |
2009-01-16 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 15. | |
2009-01-15 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |