CA SB53 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11121 of the Government Code, relating to state government, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Open meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB53 Wilk et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Result (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB53 Wilk et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Result (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)). |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 744.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 598.) (April 8). |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 331.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Set for hearing March 12. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Read first time. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 10. |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |