CA SB529 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8.5 (commencing with Section 25730) to Division 15 of the Public Resources Code, relating to transportation electrification.
Title
Electric vehicle sharing services: affordable housing facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 903.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 637.) (April 10). |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and TRANS. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25730 | New Code | See Bill Text |