CA SB525 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
Hearing: Apr 21 @ 1:00 pm in Senate Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 131325) to Part 1 of Division 112 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to school closures and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School closures: mental health effects.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 21.
2021-03-24SenateRe-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
2021-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-18SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2021-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code131325New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback