CA SB525 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4576 to the Penal Code, relating to correctional facilities.
Title
Correctional facilities: wireless communication devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB525 Padilla (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-05 - Assembly - SB 525 Padilla Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - SENATE 3RD READING SB525 PADILLA (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-05 - Assembly - SB 525 Padilla Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - SENATE 3RD READING SB525 PADILLA (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |
2010-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-02 | Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2010-08-23 | Returned by Governor at the request of the Senate. Held at desk. | |
2010-08-11 | Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-09 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4408.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-05 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-05 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6055.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-07-01 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |
2010-06-15 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |
2010-03-08 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-03-02 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-02-10 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-02-04 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-01-25 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-01-25 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2704.) To Assembly. | |
2010-01-20 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-01-19 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-01-13 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2665.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-01-08 | Set for hearing January 12. | |
2010-01-07 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-12-16 | To Com. on RLS. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |