CA SB509 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 219, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 219, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3090 of, and to add Section 3046.1 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Optometry: COVID-19 pandemic: temporary licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Sen. Steve Glazer [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB509 Wilk et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SB 509 Wilk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB509 Wilk et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SB 509 Wilk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB509 Wilk et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 219, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2215.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2524.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2021-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1086.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 840.) (April 19). |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 3046.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3090 | Amended Code | Citation Text |