CA SB494 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 799, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 799, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8587.8 of, and to add Section 8587.9 to, the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Emergency services: seismic safety and earthquake-related programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB494 Hill Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 494 Hill Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB494 Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 494 Hill Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB494 Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 799, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2667.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2950.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | July 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1072.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 796.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8587.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8587.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |