CA SB475 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-14 - August 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-14 - August 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 26153.1 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis: trade samples.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB475 Skinner et al (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB475 Skinner et al (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1154.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 846.) (April 24). |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 511.) (April 1). |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and GOV. & F. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26153.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |