CA SB444 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 17131.14 to, and to add and repeal Section 17131.13 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income tax: exclusions: educational awards.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] |
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB444 Hertzberg et al (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-06-06 | Assembly | June 6 hearing: Heard for testimony only. |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-01-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2774.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Hertzberg. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Hertzberg. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1191.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 633.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17131.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17131.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |