CA SB442 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 253, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 253, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7096, 9274, 30459.4, 32474, 40214, 41174, 43525, 45870, 46625, 50156.14, 55335, and 60633.1 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
State Board of Equalization: erroneous charges.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB442 Wyland Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-08 - Assembly - SB 442 Wyland Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Special Consent #3 SB442 Wyland (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-08 - Assembly - SB 442 Wyland Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Special Consent #3 SB442 Wyland (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 253, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1945.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2484.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2013-06-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 809.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 484.) (April 10). |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 30459.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 32474 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 40214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 41174 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 43525 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 45870 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 46625 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 50156.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 55335 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 60633.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7096 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 9274 | Amended Code | Citation Text |