CA SB438 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 389, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 389, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53110 of, and to add Section 53100.5 to, the Government Code, and to add Sections 1797.223 and 1798.8 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Emergency medical services: dispatch.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB438 Hertzberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 438 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Eggman (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB438 Hertzberg et al (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 438 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Eggman (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB438 Hertzberg et al (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 389, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 2501.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 4. Page 2952.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | July 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and HEALTH. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 1208.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 904.) (May 1). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 713.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53100.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 53110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.223 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1798.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |