CA SB407 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8726 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Professional Land Surveyors’ Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Archuleta. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 669.) (April 5). |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 573.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 8726 | Amended Code | Citation Text |