CA SB397 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-19 - Stricken from Senate file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-19 - Stricken from Senate file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 789.10 and 10127.7 of the Insurance Code, relating to life insurance.
Title
Life insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB397 Calderon Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-08 - Assembly - SB 397 Calderon Senate Third Reading By TORRICO (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB397 Calderon (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-08 - Assembly - SB 397 Calderon Senate Third Reading By TORRICO (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB397 Calderon (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-19 | Stricken from Senate file. | |
2009-10-11 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-28 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2009-09-10 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 2373.) To enrollment. | |
2009-09-09 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-09-08 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3062.) To Senate. | |
2009-09-02 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 2890.) | |
2009-09-01 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 2861.) To third reading. (Corrected September 2.) | |
2009-08-27 | From Consent Calendar to third reading. | |
2009-08-24 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-08-20 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.) | |
2009-07-09 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.) | |
2009-06-08 | To Com. on INS. | |
2009-06-01 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 1107.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-19 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 18. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 699.) | |
2009-04-27 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |
2009-04-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |
2009-04-14 | Set for hearing April 29. | |
2009-04-13 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |
2009-04-01 | Set for hearing April 15. | |
2009-03-12 | To Com. on B., F. & I. | |
2009-02-27 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |