CA SB389 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 182.1 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Department of Transportation: transportation project delivery services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB389 Roth (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB389 Roth (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Assembly | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1247.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Published May 16 at 9 p.m. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1080.) (May 15). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | May 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 750.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 182.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |