CA SB362 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 709, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 709, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1798.99.80, 1798.99.81, 1798.99.82, and 1798.99.84 of, and to add Sections 1798.99.85, 1798.99.86, 1798.99.87, and 1798.99.89 to, the Civil Code, relating to data brokers.
Title
Data broker registration: accessible deletion mechanism.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] | Asm. Gregg Hart [D] |
Asm. Josh Lowenthal [D] | Sen. Dave Min [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB362 Becker et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 362 Becker Senate Third Reading By Gabriel (Y: 52 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB362 Becker et al (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 362 Becker Senate Third Reading By Gabriel (Y: 52 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB362 Becker et al (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 709, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2840.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 14. Page 3411.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-07-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 1389.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1167.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 893.) (April 25). |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | April 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.99.80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.99.81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.99.82 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.99.84 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.99.85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1798.99.86 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1798.99.87 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1798.99.89 | New Code | See Bill Text |