CA SB323 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 650.01 and 805 of, to amend and renumber Section 2837 of, and to add Section 2837 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Nurse practitioners: scope of practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB323 Hernandez (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB323 Hernandez (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | June 28 set for final hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | July 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 2358.) |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | July 7 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-30 | Assembly | June 30 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 5. Page 931.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 884.) (May 4). |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 699.) (April 20). |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2835.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2837 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 650.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |