CA SB311 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 384, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 4.9 (commencing with Section 1649) to Division 2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Compassionate Access to Medical Cannabis Act or Ryan’s Law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB311 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Assembly - SB 311 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 311 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Wood Amendment Set #1 (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB311 Hueso et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 384, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
2021-09-10SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 1.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 1.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-09-02AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-02 Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2021-09-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2021-09-01AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-01AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 52. Noes 1.)
2021-06-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-06-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 8).
2021-06-08AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-05-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-03-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 568.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-03-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-03-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 457.) (March 10).
2021-03-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-02-23SenateSet for hearing March 10.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-17SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-02-05SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
2021-02-04SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1649New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback