CA SB309 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 325, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 325, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18733 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Personal income tax: California Senior Citizen Advocacy Voluntary Tax Contribution Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-19 - Assembly - SB 309 Rubio Third Reading Urgency By Blanca Rubio (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Date (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Aging and Long-Term Care] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB309 Rubio et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Date (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Aging and Long-Term Care] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB309 Rubio et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 325, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2755.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | June 17 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and AGING & L.T.C. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 998.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 872.) (April 29). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 713.) (April 10). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18733 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |