CA SB302 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13997 of, and add Section 13996.44 to, the Government Code, relating to economic development.
Title
International trade and investment office: Republic of Armenia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB302 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB302 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1274.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1095.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 424.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13996.44 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 13997 | Amended Code | Citation Text |