CA SB300 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 60605.85 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: instructional materials: content
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB300 Hancock Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Assembly - SB 300 Hancock Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB300 Hancock (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Assembly - SB 300 Hancock Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB300 Hancock (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2011-09-01 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 2239.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-31 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 2744.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-26 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-07-13 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-28 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 22). | |
2011-06-13 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 1237.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1115.) (May 26). | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-16 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-06 | Set for hearing May 16. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 850.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-21 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 60200.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 60605.85 | New Code | See Bill Text |