CA SB297 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-03 - July 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-03 - July 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 17380) of Part 10.5 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to school facilities.
Title
School facilities: approval of plans: preliminary build contract.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB297 Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB297 Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Assembly | July 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | June 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1007.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 464.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 17380 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |