CA SB296 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69433.9 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
Student financial aid: immigrants seeking asylum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB296 Allen et al. Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - SB 296 Allen Senate Third Reading By Medina (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB296 Allen (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - SB 296 Allen Senate Third Reading By Medina (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB296 Allen (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Veto sustained. | |
2020-01-13 | Stricken from file. | |
2019-10-13 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-10-13 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 2889.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 9. Page 3435.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 30). |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | June 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 1184.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1095.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 547.) (April 3). |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69433.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |