CA SB274 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4980.10, 4999.47, 4999.54, 4999.102, and 4999.104 of, to add Sections 4989.13, 4991.1, and 4999.13 to, and to repeal Sections 4999.56 and 4999.101 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Healing arts.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-07-14 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB274 Wyland Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Assembly - SB 274 Wyland Third Reading Urgency By SMYTH (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB274 Wyland (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Assembly - SB 274 Wyland Third Reading Urgency By SMYTH (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB274 Wyland (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-08-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-07-19 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2011-07-14 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1862.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-07-11 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 2265.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-07-07 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-14 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-03 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-05-23 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-05-16 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-16 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 987.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 736.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-15 | Set for hearing April 25. | |
2011-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-04-11 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4980.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4989.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4991.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.101 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.47 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.56 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |