CA SB270 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8041 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to court reporters.
Title
Shorthand reporting services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 270 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By REV.& TAX. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB270 Mendoza (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB270 Mendoza (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | August 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5952.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (August 10). |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 28). |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 6.) (June 21). |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | July 7 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-30 | Assembly | June 30 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | June 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1070.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1033.) (May 18). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 818.) (April 28). |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 699.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | April 13 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 8000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8040 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8040.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8040.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8041 | New Code | See Bill Text |